NH HB586 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 144; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 144; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of certain professions by the office of professional licensure and certification.
Title
Relative to the regulation of certain professions by the office of professional licensure and certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 144; Eff. 8/15/2017 |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1312s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 6 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1312s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1312s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1312s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0688h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0688h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0688h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14 |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 20 |