NH HB585 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB585
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Allowing the prepayment of dog licensing fees for the duration of a rabies vaccination and reducing fines related thereto.
Title
Allowing the prepayment of dog licensing fees for the duration of a rabies vaccination and reducing fines related thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB585-FN-LOCAL 10/25/2021 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 10 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive Session: 10/19/2021 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/19/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-08-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2021-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/20/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91984660981 |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/06/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94919879599 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97165419816 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 55 |
Same As/Similar To
HB585 (Carry Over) 2021-10-19 - Executive Session: 10/19/2021 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=569&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB585 |