NH HB584 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing coastal management provisions in master plans.
Title
Authorizing coastal management provisions in master plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.687 | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 2 (Vote 13-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.392 | |
2011-02-15 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-02-09 | House Vacated from Public Works and Highways and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 16, PG.308 | |
2011-02-01 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 11, PG. 192 |