NH HB583 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to proceedings of medical injury claims screening panels.
Title
Relative to proceedings of medical injury claims screening panels.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 4/30/13, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0458h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 201-153; House Journal 26, PG.781 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0458h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.781 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.518 |
2013-02-21 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0458h; House Calendar 22B, PG.575 |
2013-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0458h for Mar 13 (Vote 12-6; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.518 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.201 |