NH HB582 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 150-117 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the license requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the license requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-16 - House - Veto Override (Y: 150 N: 117 NV: 92 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 146 NV: 21 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-16HouseVeto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 150-117 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2016-05-31HouseVetoed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016
2016-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/19/2016
2016-05-20SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-05SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17
2016-04-21SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
2016-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15
2016-02-25SenateHearing: 03/14/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2016-02-17SenateIntroduced 02/11/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5
2016-01-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2399h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-146 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 81
2016-01-26HouseAmendment #2015-2399h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 81
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2399h for Jan 6 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 15-16
2015-10-07HouseExecutive Session: 10/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-09-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-08-04HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 230

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=798&sy=2016&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=HB582
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?id=146&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2016&id=146&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=13&sy=2016&lb=H&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=798
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=68&sy=2016&lb=S&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=798
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=91&sy=2016&lb=S&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=798
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=231&sy=2016&lb=H&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=798

Bill Comments

feedback