NH HB582 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the license requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the license requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2399h for Jan 6 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 15-16
2015-10-07HouseExecutive Session: 10/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-09-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-08-04HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 230

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback