NH HB582 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to early offers for medical injury claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to early offers for medical injury claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1853s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1746s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 134 NV: 25 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30SenateConference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15
2014-05-23HouseCommittee of Conference Meeting: 5/28/2014; 1:00 PM; Legislative Office Building 208
2014-05-22SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Boutin, Bradley, and Lasky; Senate Journal 14
2014-05-22SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
2014-05-21HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Heffron, Hopper, Wall, Woodbury
2014-05-21HouseRep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014)
2014-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1853s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13
2014-05-15SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2014-1853s, Amendment Adopted, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N
2014-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment 1746s, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 11Y- 13N
2014-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1746s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18
2014-03-03SenateHearing: 3/11/14, Room 100, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2318h(NT) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-134
2014-01-22HouseAdopt Amendment #2318h (NT) Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-01-20HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-2318h (New Title)
2013-11-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2318h(NT) for Jan 8 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 3
2013-09-10HouseRetained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2013-09-10HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2013-09-10HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2013-07-23HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2013-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2013-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2013-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.201

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback