NH HB582 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing early offers for medical injury claims.
Title
Repealing early offers for medical injury claims.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2318h for Jan 8 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar) |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-07-23 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.201 |