NH HB582 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - House Signed By Governor 06/07/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to communication between employers and employees during bargaining negotiations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to communication between employers and employees during bargaining negotiations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-11 House Signed By Governor 06/07/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0161
2012-05-30 House Enrolled [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2495
2012-05-23 Senate Enrolled
2012-05-17 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2175e Adopted; House Journal 46, PG.2485
2012-05-16 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2175e Adopted
2012-05-02 Senate Ought to Pass: Div. 9Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.471
2012-04-25 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17
2012-04-18 Senate Hearing: 4/24/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16
2012-02-15 Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6, Pg.144
2012-01-11 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2761h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.535
2012-01-11 House Print Remarks Between Rep Jasper and Rep Daniels in Permanent Journal (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 302-40; House Journal 9, PG.535
2012-01-11 House Amendment #2761h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.535
2011-10-21 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2761h; House Calendar 69, PG.2157
2011-10-21 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2761h for Jan 4 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2223
2011-09-27 House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2011-09-27 House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/4/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2011-09-13 House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/21/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2011-09-12 House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/20/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2011-03-01 House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824
2011-02-23 House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2011-02-10 House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 (Orig 1:45 PM)
2011-01-24 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 11, PG. 192

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback