NH HB582 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-21 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2761h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-21 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2761h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to communication between employers and employees during bargaining negotiations.
Title
Relative to communication between employers and employees during bargaining negotiations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2761h | |
2011-10-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2761h for Jan 4 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar) | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/4/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/21/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-09-12 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/20/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-10 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 (Orig 1:45 PM) | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 11, PG. 192 |