NH HB581 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2021; Chapter 158; Eff: 07/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the burden of proof in special education hearings and establishing a committee to study special education IEP and dispute resolution processes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the burden of proof in special education hearings and establishing a committee to study special education IEP and dispute resolution processes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-03HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/29/2021; Chapter 158; Eff: 07/29/2021
2021-06-11HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 21
2021-06-11SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 19
2021-05-13SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
2021-05-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23
2021-04-07SenateRemote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0823h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 10
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0823h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 10
2021-03-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0823h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 8
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing: 03/02/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97910276071 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 54

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback