NH HB581 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a credit against business profits taxes for media production expenditures in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a credit against business profits taxes for media production expenditures in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 58 |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 23-0; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 20 |