NH HB578 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment at time of medical services.
Title
Relative to payment at time of medical services.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] | Rep. Thomas Beattie [R] | Rep. Marilinda Garcia [R] | Rep. Jane Johnson [R] |
Rep. Richard Okerman [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.373 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2201 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302) | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 10/18/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-08-23 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 9/13/2011 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/4/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 192 |