NH HB576 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 91; Eff:08/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 91; Eff:08/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administration of a commercial property assessed clean energy (C-PACE) program in a clean energy efficiency and clean energy district.
Title
Relative to administration of a commercial property assessed clean energy (C-PACE) program in a clean energy efficiency and clean energy district.
Sponsors
Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] | Rep. William Darby [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Rep. David Preece [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 91; Eff:08/19/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/18/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22A |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0692h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 210 |
2023-04-06 | House | Amendment # 2023-0692h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 209 |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0162h (NT) 01/31/2023 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0692h 03/22/2023 (Vote 21-4; Regular Calendar) |
2023-03-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-23 | House | Division Work Session: 03/03/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-16 | House | Division Work Session: 02/21/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0162h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 26 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0162h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 26 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 21 |