NH HB575 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 246; Eff. 7/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the certification of acupuncture detoxification specialists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the certification of acupuncture detoxification specialists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 246; Eff. 7/1/2017
2017-07-05HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27
2017-07-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2382e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 26
2017-06-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2382e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-22HouseConference Committee Report 2291c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21
2017-06-22SenateConference Committee Report #2017-2291c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20
2017-06-15SenateConference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2291c; 06/15/2017
2017-06-09HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/13/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-06-08SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Reagan, Soucy; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-08SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Hansen, Campion, Proulx, Gagnon 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3
2017-06-01HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1649s and Requests CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3
2017-05-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1649s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment #2017-1649s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateSpecial Order HB 575 to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateSen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 575 from the Consent Calendar; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2017-03-23SenateHearing: 03/29/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0680h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 27
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0680h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 27
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0680h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14
2017-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/28/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-01HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-01-19HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback