NH HB573 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB573 on Table (Rep. Lane): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB573 on Table (Rep. Lane): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting education freedom account funding to budgeted amounts.
Title
Limiting education freedom account funding to budgeted amounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Lay HB573 on Table (Rep. Lane): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/13/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 22 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 21 |