NH HB573 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to charitable gambling dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to charitable gambling dates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019
2019-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 15
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback