NH HB571 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the cost of living adjustments for certain group II retirees in the New Hampshire retirement system.
Title
Relative to the cost of living adjustments for certain group II retirees in the New Hampshire retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | House | Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37 |
2023-03-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/28/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-03-17 | House | Division Work Session: 03/20/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-03-10 | House | Division Work Session: 03/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-27 | House | Division Work Session: 03/02/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 46 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 192-167 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 46 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/08/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 12 |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 21 |