NH HB569 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 184-154 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 184-154 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the reimbursement of dedicated funds transferred for other purposes.
Title
Requiring the reimbursement of dedicated funds transferred for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Shepardson [D] | Rep. Suzanne Harvey [D] | Rep. David Danielson [R] | Rep. Carol Roberts [D] |
Rep. Robert Backus [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 184-154 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48 |
2017-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 23 |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 19 |