NH HB569 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Including certain nonprofit charitable enterprises under the business enterprise tax and reducing the rate of the tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including certain nonprofit charitable enterprises under the business enterprise tax and reducing the rate of the tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11
2015-10-21HouseContinued Executive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-20House===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-20House===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 10/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-23HouseExecutive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202==RECESSED==
2015-09-23HouseContinued Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-22House==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 9/29/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202==RECESSED==
2015-09-21House==CANCELED==Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-10HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 2/10/2015 10:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-02HouseContinued Public Hearing: 2/6/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/2/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED==
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 230

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback