NH HB569 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-59; House Journal 30, PG.1024-1026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-59; House Journal 30, PG.1024-1026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing domestic union as a valid contract and extending certain rights to parties to a domestic union.
Title
Establishing domestic union as a valid contract and extending certain rights to parties to a domestic union.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - ITL (Y: 232 N: 59 NV: 107 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-59; House Journal 30, PG.1024-1026 | |
2011-03-17 | House Lay on the Table (Rep Bolster): Motion Failed Division Vote 74-186; House Journal 30, PG.1024 | |
2011-03-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Cohn); House Journal 26, PG.694 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.534 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 (If Necessary Continued 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208) | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 10:30 Amendment Representative's Hall | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |