NH HB566 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consolidation of school administrative units.
Title
Relative to consolidation of school administrative units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 782 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 398 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 9:55 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |