NH HB565 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2299h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2299h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to actions under the consumer protection law.
Title
Relative to actions under the consumer protection law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2299h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-04 | House | ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-10 | House | ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.200 |