NH HB565 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a dental hygienists committee within the board of dental examiners.
Title
Establishing a dental hygienists committee within the board of dental examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0172 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.515 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/19/11, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0755h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.804-805 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0755h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.804-805 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0755h; House Calendar 23, PG.642 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0755h for Mar 15 (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.554 | |
2011-03-08 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |