NH HB562 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing online gambling.
Title
Allowing online gambling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-17 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)