NH HB562 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the limitation on the total education grant distributed to a municipality in a fiscal year and reducing the stabilization grants to certain municipalities.
Title
Repealing the limitation on the total education grant distributed to a municipality in a fiscal year and reducing the stabilization grants to certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 7 |
2015-10-16 | House | Executive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-07-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 8/11/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-03-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session: 3/18/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-03-10 | House | Division II Work Session: 3/12/2015 1:20 PM State House 103 |
2015-02-25 | House | Division II Work Session: 3/2/2015 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 510 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 245 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |