NH HB561 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB561

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 293; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to part-time employment of a retirement system retiree by a participating employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to part-time employment of a retirement system retiree by a participating employer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - House - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - Floor Amendment 0172s (Y: 4 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - House - Committee Amendment 0110s (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 293; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 2055c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-2055c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2055c; 05/17/2018
2018-05-15House==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-05-14House==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-05-02SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Bradley, Soucy; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-05HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. McGuire, Sytek, Proulx, Goley 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2
2018-04-05HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 0110s and 0611s and Requests CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2
2018-02-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0611s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-0611s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateSpecial Order to the Call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-30SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7
2018-01-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0110s, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateSen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2018-0172s, Regular Calendar 4Y-20N, Amendment Failed; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0110s, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Amendment Adopted; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0110s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3
2018-01-08SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-05SenateHearing: 01/10/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-0027s; Senate Calendar 2A
2017-12-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2549s, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48
2017-05-11SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-03SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-05SenateHearing: 04/12/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 18
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0611h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 26
2017-03-08HouseAmendment # 2017-0611h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 26
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0611h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13
2017-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-21House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2017-02-16House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/23/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 18

Same As/Similar To

HB561 (Carry Over) 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2549s

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=651&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB561
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=695&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=695
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=695
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=17&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0561&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB561&ddlsponsors=&lsr=651
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=18&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0561&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB561&ddlsponsors=&lsr=651
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=19&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0561&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB561&ddlsponsors=&lsr=651
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=47&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0561&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB561&ddlsponsors=&lsr=651

Bill Comments

feedback