NH HB560 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing keno.
Title
Establishing keno.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am, on proposed amendment #2017-1385s; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0481h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 57 |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment #2017-0481h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 57 |
2017-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0481h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-3; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB560 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17