NH HB56 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permits for the siting of new landfills.
Title
Relative to permits for the siting of new landfills.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0772h: Motion Adopted DV 224-155 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 80 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0772h: Amendment Adopted DV 233-155 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 80 |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/07/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 26 |
2023-03-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/28/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |