NH HB559 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB559

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to expenditures from the energy efficiency fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to expenditures from the energy efficiency fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - Table (Y: 153 N: 189 NV: 16 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-01-09 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 215 N: 126 NV: 17 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 160 N: 182 NV: 16 Abs: 34) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0378h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 86
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0378h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 86
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0378h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 24-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 41
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-24HouseDivision I Work Session: 01/31/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2018-01-11HouseDivision I Work Session: 01/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Finance 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 24
2018-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2479h: Motion Adopted DV 197-147 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 24
2018-01-09HouseLay HB 559 on Table (Rep. J. Graham): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 153-189 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 22
2018-01-09HouseAmendment # 2017-2479h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 215-126 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 20
2018-01-09HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 160-182 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 17
2018-01-03HouseSpecial Order to fourth order of business on 1/9/2018 (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 91
2017-10-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2479h
2017-10-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar)
2017-10-18HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-10-18House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-10-12House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-09-28HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-09-13HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-07-31HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-21HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-15HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/31/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 18

Same As/Similar To

HB559 (Carry Over) 2017-10-30 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2479h

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=470&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB559
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=476&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=476
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=476
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=19&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0559&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB559&ddlsponsors=&lsr=470
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=20&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0559&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB559&ddlsponsors=&lsr=470
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0559&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB559&ddlsponsors=&lsr=470
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=190&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0559&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB559&ddlsponsors=&lsr=470

Bill Comments

feedback