NH HB559 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study methods of encouraging the installation and use of small scale renewable energy resources by homeowners and businesses and authorizing the development of a solar photovoltaic renewable energy project in Manchester.
Title
Establishing a committee to study methods of encouraging the installation and use of small scale renewable energy resources by homeowners and businesses and authorizing the development of a solar photovoltaic renewable energy project in Manchester.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjamin Baroody [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.540 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |