NH HB556 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duties of the information technology council.
Title
Relative to the duties of the information technology council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 26 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB556-FN 03/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13 |
2023-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 20 |