NH HB556 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB556
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to state-ordered counseling.
Title
Relative to state-ordered counseling.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. Frances Nutter-Upham [D] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-09-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/05/2022 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 4 |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754 |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99169761614 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 53 |
Same As/Similar To
HB556 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=739&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB556 |