NH HB556 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities to process absentee ballots prior to election day.
Title
Allowing municipalities to process absentee ballots prior to election day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/06/2019; Senate Calendar 25 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0453h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 32 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0453h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 32 |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0453h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB556 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar