NH HB556 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 06/25/2013; Chapter 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 06/25/2013; Chapter 0112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the resolution of barriers to the use of telehealth technology in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the resolution of barriers to the use of telehealth technology in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Signed By Governor 06/25/2013; Effective 06/25/2013; Chapter 0112 |
2013-05-30 | House | Enrolled, 5/29/13; House Journal 45, PG.1527 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1681e Adopted, 5/22/13; House Journal 43, PG.1499 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1681e Adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1212s (Rep J.MacKay): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1386 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1212s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1212s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1212s, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0735h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.760-761 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0735h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.760-761 |
2013-03-05 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0735h; House Calendar 22, PG.556 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0735h for Mar 13 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.507 |
2013-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.200 |