NH HB553 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to biennial motorcycle inspections.
Title
Relative to biennial motorcycle inspections.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Josh Moore [R] | Rep. Dan Hynes [R] |
Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Table (Y: 246 N: 96 NV: 18 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 246-96 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 54 |
2017-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-3; Regular Calendar) |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/14/2017 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 18 |