NH HB552 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2554h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the state treasurer to develop an implementation plan for the state to accept bitcoin as payment for taxes and fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the state treasurer to develop an implementation plan for the state to accept bitcoin as payment for taxes and fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2554h
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 28
2015-10-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-10-14HouseContinued Executive Session: 11/4/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-23House==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202==RECESSED==
2015-09-16House==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-08HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-17HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-17HouseExecutive Session: 2/17/2015 Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-12HouseContinued Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED==
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 229

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback