NH HB552 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.801-802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.801-802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child support expenditures.
Title
Relative to child support expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Jane Johnson [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.801-802 |
2013-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 15-0; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.521 |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG.200 |