NH HB552 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study repealing the revisions to the law implemented by SB 500-FN of the 2010 legislative session.
Title
Establishing a committee to study repealing the revisions to the law implemented by SB 500-FN of the 2010 legislative session.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Leo Pepino [R] |
Rep. Marshall Quandt [R] | Rep. Kathleen Souza [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1018 | |
2011-03-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Pepino); House Journal 26, PG.694 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.527 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |