NH HB551 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to preventing diversion of business income to tax havens.
Title
Relative to preventing diversion of business income to tax havens.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Ames [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. David Karrick [D] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Chase [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1263-1264 |
2015-03-11 | House | Special Order to end of Regular Calendar (Rep Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 814 |
2015-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0557h |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 410-411 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-05 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 229 |