NH HB550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 175; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 175; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extending foster care beyond age 18.
Title
Extending foster care beyond age 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 175; Eff: 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0301h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0301h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0301h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 2 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 19 |