NH HB549 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB549
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 02/24/2022; Chapter 5; Eff.01/01/22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 02/24/2022; Chapter 5; Eff.01/01/22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the system benefits charge and the energy efficiency and sustainable energy board.
Title
Relative to the system benefits charge and the energy efficiency and sustainable energy board.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Michael Harrington [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Rene Nunez [R] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 343 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 187 N: 156 NV: 50 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 187 N: 156 NV: 50 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 02/24/2022; Chapter 5; Eff.01/01/22 |
2022-02-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 02/16/2022); Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-0165S (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0165s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0165s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0165s, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2205: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 343-0 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Amendment # 2021-2299h: Amendment Failed DV 155-189 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Amendment # 2021-2205h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 187-156 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2205h 11/15/2021 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 42 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-10-01 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-2158h: 10/12/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: 1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91732382660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
Same As/Similar To
HB549 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304