NH HB545 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 65; Eff: 08/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 65; Eff: 08/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of certain out-of-state banks by the state treasurer and municipal and county treasurers or trustees.
Title
Relative to the use of certain out-of-state banks by the state treasurer and municipal and county treasurers or trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 65; Eff: 08/03/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/20/2021); Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/26/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 44 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 21 |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 12:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97119253057 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 53 |