NH HB544 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizing cannabis for retail sale.
Title
Legalizing cannabis for retail sale.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Christine Seibert [D] |
Rep. Shaun Filiault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 37 |
2023-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB544-FN 11/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 5 |
2023-11-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-17 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 11/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 42 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:20 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB544 (Carry Over) 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36