NH HB544 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Lay on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted DV 347-18 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the propagation of divisive concepts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the propagation of divisive concepts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted DV 347-18 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 72
2021-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0611h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 45
2021-02-11House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/18/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97238685330 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-03House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/11/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/91078617911 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 53

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback