NH HB544 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 174; Sec. 2 Eff: as provided in Sec.3 II. Rem. Eff: 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the governance of the Manchester school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the governance of the Manchester school district.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 174; Sec. 2 Eff: as provided in Sec.3 II. Rem. Eff: 07/10/2019
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-06SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-05-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 06/06/2019; Senate Calendar 25
2019-05-08SenateHearing: 05/16/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 22
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 7
2019-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback