NH HB544 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to earned time credits for prisoners participating in rehabilitative or educational programming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to earned time credits for prisoners participating in rehabilitative or educational programming.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-15HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-09-06HouseExecutive Session: 11/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-10-25HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-05-17HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 05/23/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-10-18HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/25/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-31HouseRetained in Committee
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2017 Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback