NH HB544 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-21; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to access to health insurance coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to access to health insurance coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-08 - House - Commit (Y: 151 N: 184 NV: 59 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 182 N: 154 NV: 58 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - Recommit (Y: 152 N: 184 NV: 58 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 145 N: 195 NV: 55 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 146 N: 196 NV: 53 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 131 N: 211 NV: 53 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 186 N: 155 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - Uphold Ruling of the Chair (Y: 215 N: 126 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - House - Divide Sect 1-8 (Y: 160 N: 183 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-08 - House - ITL (Y: 165 N: 178 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-17SenateWithout objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-21; Senate Journal 9
2014-01-08HouseMotion to Refer to Finance (Rep. Itse): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 151-184
2014-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2014-0025h (NT) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-154
2014-01-08HouseMotion to Recommit (Rep. Hunt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 152-184
2014-01-08HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0029h (Rep. Hoell): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 145-195
2014-01-08HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0031h (Rep. Hoell): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 146-196
2014-01-08HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0030h (Rep. Hoell): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 131-211
2014-01-08HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0025h (New Title) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-155
2014-01-08HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0025h, Divide Sections 1-8 (Rep. Jasper) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 160-183
2014-01-08HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0025h (Rep. Sherman)
2014-01-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 165-178
2013-11-25HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 1
2013-10-04House==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-09-10House==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 2/26/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.199

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=594&sy=2014&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2014/HB0544.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=3&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=4&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=5&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=6&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=7&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=8&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=9&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=10&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=11&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=12&sy=2014&lb=H&eb=HB0544&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2014&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=594

Bill Comments 750

feedback