NH HB544 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to state authority over firearms and ammunition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state authority over firearms and ammunition.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0139
2011-06-01 House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669
2011-06-01 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547
2011-05-18 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1783s (Rep Swinford): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1531
2011-05-11 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 16
2011-05-11 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1783s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16
2011-05-11 Senate Committee Amendment 1783s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
2011-05-05 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1783s, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23
2011-04-14 Senate Hearing: 4/20/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 20
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.706
2011-03-09 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.527
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2011-02-16 House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2011-01-24 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 190

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback