NH HB542 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to motor vehicle emission requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to motor vehicle emission requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 407
2015-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2015-02-10HousePublic Hearing: 3/3/2015 10:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 229

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback